LA HB386 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-16 - Becomes HB 657.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-16 - Becomes HB 657.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for infant adoptions and the Strong Louisiana Families Tax Credit for donations to certain social service organizations (OR -$16,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes a tax credit for infant adoptions and the Strong Louisiana Families Tax Credit for donations to certain social service organizations (OR -$16,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Becomes HB 657. |
2023-05-15 | House | Reported by substitute (12-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |