LA HB371 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes local taxing authorities to enter into cooperative endeavor agreements for the purpose of authorizing payments in lieu of taxes (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes local taxing authorities to enter into cooperative endeavor agreements for the purpose of authorizing payments in lieu of taxes (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |