LA HB369 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a premium discount for certain military personnel (EN -$6,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for a premium discount for certain military personnel (EN -$6,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 369 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 369 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#357) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 369 FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 369 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#357) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 369 FINAL PASSAGE (#356) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 406. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023. |
2023-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |