LA HB353 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes golf carts to cross certain Louisiana highways within the city of Westlake
Title
Authorizes golf carts to cross certain Louisiana highways within the city of Westlake
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 353 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |