LA HB337 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to direct action against an insurer
Title
Provides relative to direct action against an insurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 337 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#931) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 337 CO-AUTHORS (#548) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#125) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 86) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 AMENDMENT # 1942 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#123) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 AMENDMENT # 1864 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#122) (Y: 36 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 337 CO-AUTHORS (#548) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 ADD CO-AUTHORS (#125) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 86) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 AMENDMENT # 1942 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#123) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 337 AMENDMENT # 1864 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#122) (Y: 36 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 275. |
2024-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-08 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/2024. |
2024-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (11-7). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |