LA HB336 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: June 19, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the collection of sales and use tax imposed on the purchase of motor vehicles by certain foreign business entities (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the collection of sales and use tax imposed on the purchase of motor vehicles by certain foreign business entities (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 336 ADOPT (#1061) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 336 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1063) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 336 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#942) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 336 FINAL PASSAGE (#765) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 336 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19HouseEffective date: June 19, 2015.
2015-06-19HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 107.
2015-06-12HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-11HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2015-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2015-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2015-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2015-06-10HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2015-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2015-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Riser, and Adley.
2015-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2015-06-09SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2015-06-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Connick, Robideaux, and Harrison.
2015-06-09HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2015-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
2015-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-06-04SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-06-02SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2015-05-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2015-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
2015-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-05HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2015-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB336&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935021
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944927
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958763
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959799
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953569
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954767
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=956803
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957935
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=935071
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945627
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953893
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958429
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=959260
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=963433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947733
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=958663

Bill Comments

feedback