LA HB311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes alternative forms of insurance to satisfy the requirement that condominium associations carry a fidelity bond
Title
Authorizes alternative forms of insurance to satisfy the requirement that condominium associations carry a fidelity bond
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#717) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 79. | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-07 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-02 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2012-04-09 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-05 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/5/2012. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2012-03-27 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. |