LA HB300 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective date: July 1, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorization for the La. Tax Commission to levy and collect certain fees (EN +$527,850 SD RV See Note)
Title
Authorization for the La. Tax Commission to levy and collect certain fees (EN +$527,850 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 300, FINAL PASSAGE (#1406) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 300, FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 300, FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Effective date: July 1, 2010. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 464. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-05-18 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-10 | Notice given. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 19, 2010. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported favorably (7-6) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-11 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-11 | Prefiled. |