LA HB299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the "contract limit" for certain public work related drainage projects completed by regular maintenance employees of any governing authority (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Increases the "contract limit" for certain public work related drainage projects completed by regular maintenance employees of any governing authority (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |