LA HB283 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 16 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 16 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain traffic violations be heard in certain courts (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that certain traffic violations be heard in certain courts (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate (#1952) (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 283, FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-20 | Read by title. The Senate failed to approve consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 16 yeas and 16 nays. | |
2010-06-16 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-16 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |
2010-06-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-27 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-04-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-15 | Reported with amendments (12-0-2) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-11 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-11 | Prefiled. |