LA HB27 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Effective date: 03/26/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the tax on certain telecommunication devices and services (Item #10) (EN +$213,000 SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the tax on certain telecommunication devices and services (Item #10) (EN +$213,000 SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27 CO-AUTHORS (#41) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Vote on HB 27 FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseEffective date: 03/26/2018.
2018-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
2018-03-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-03-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-03-05SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-04SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-02SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2018-03-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-02-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/02/18.
2018-02-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-02-21HouseRules suspended.
2018-02-21HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2018-02-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=181ES&b=HB27&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1064821
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065755
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073618
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084497
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1064822
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065030
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065844
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1066282
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073698
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073608

Bill Comments

feedback