LA HB234 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that local political subdivisions may authorize a sales and use tax exemption for qualifying radiation therapy treatment centers (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Clarifies that local political subdivisions may authorize a sales and use tax exemption for qualifying radiation therapy treatment centers (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 234, ADOPT (#2037) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1959) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1611) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#1405) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#181) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1959) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1611) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#1405) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#181) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1015. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee report received. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice of change in House conferees: Carter, Greene, Billiot. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-17 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Alario, Marionneaux, and Heitmeier. | |
2010-06-17 | House conferees appointed: Carter, Greene, and Jackson, Girod | |
2010-06-16 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-19 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2010-04-15 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 15, 2010. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-06 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-09 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2010-03-09 | Prefiled. |