LA HB231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to procedures for reporting child abuse
Title
Provides relative to procedures for reporting child abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |