LA HB229 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Relative to public retirement systems, requires a 2/3 vote to enact any changes to retirement provisions having an actuarial cost (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Relative to public retirement systems, requires a 2/3 vote to enact any changes to retirement provisions having an actuarial cost (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Vote on HB 229, FINAL PASSAGE (#1114) (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 229, FINAL PASSAGE (#745) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-08 Effective date: See Act.
2010-07-08 Becomes Act No. 1048.
2010-06-10 Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2010-06-09 Signed by the President of the Senate.
2010-06-09 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-09 Received from the Senate without amendments.
2010-06-08 Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-05-26 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-05-25 Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-05-24 Reported favorably.
2010-05-13 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2010-05-12 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2010-05-11 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-05-07 Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010.
2010-05-05 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-05-04 Reported without amendments (12-0) (Regular).
2010-05-03 Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-04-29 Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2010-03-12 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010.
2010-03-09 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2010-03-09 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback