LA HB222 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to out-of-school suspensions and expulsions of public school students (EGF INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to out-of-school suspensions and expulsions of public school students (EGF INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 222 3 Minute Rule (#773) (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-12 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (5-4-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |