LA HB207 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating income taxes and eliminates the mandatory deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating income taxes and eliminates the mandatory deduction for federal income taxes paid for purposes of computing income taxes (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (14-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |