LA HB201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires indemnification of healthcare providers by Medicaid managed care organizations in certain circumstances
Title
Requires indemnification of healthcare providers by Medicaid managed care organizations in certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |