LA HB199 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the TEFRA option within the La. Medicaid program to serve children with disabilities (RE1 +$9,340,656 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the TEFRA option within the La. Medicaid program to serve children with disabilities (RE1 +$9,340,656 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]
Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Pat Moore [D]
Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]
Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]
Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]
Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]
Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 199 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#881) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#841) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 199 CO-AUTHORS (#840) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#393) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB199&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118814
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127525
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135582
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142051
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125735
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127509
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128076
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132266
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140097
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141931
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118834
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126688
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127912
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131592
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135842
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137959
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138949
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135559
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141165

Bill Comments

feedback