LA HB198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increases fees for participation in the commercial crab fishery (EN +$54,000 SD RV See Note)
Title
Increases fees for participation in the commercial crab fishery (EN +$54,000 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#395) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 198 FINAL PASSAGE (#395) (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 303. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015. |
2015-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (7-6). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2015-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2015-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |