LA HB189 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to alcoholic beverages
Title
Provides relative to alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 189 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1060) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#760) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#760) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | House | Effective date: 06/14/2023. |
2023-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 365. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2023. |
2023-05-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2023-03-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023. |
2023-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2023-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |