LA HB165 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a nine-member State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for a nine-member State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (OR DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-24 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |
2012-02-20 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-20 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB165 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=772220 |