LA HB1485 | 2010 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB635

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the LaPOST program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the LaPOST program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 1485, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1879) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1485, FINAL PASSAGE (#1754) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1485, FINAL PASSAGE (#1042) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-02 Effective date: August 15, 2010.
2010-07-02 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 954.
2010-06-23 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2010-06-21 Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23.
2010-06-21 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2010-06-20 Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2010-06-18 Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
2010-06-17 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2010-06-17 Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2010-06-11 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2010-06-10 Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2010-06-09 Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2010-06-01 Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2010-05-27 Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2010-05-26 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-05-20 Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010.
2010-05-20 Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-05-19 Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 635 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (8-2).

Same As/Similar To

HB635 (Replaces) 2010-05-19 - Becomes HB 1485.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback