LA HB635 | 2010 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB1485
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Becomes HB 1485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Becomes HB 1485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the LaPOST program
Title
Provides for the LaPOST program
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Becomes HB 1485. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported by substitute (8-2) (Regular) | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1485 (Replaced by) 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB635 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=685593 |