LA HB148 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the expenses of the judiciary for Fiscal Year 2019-2020
Title
Appropriates funds for the expenses of the judiciary for Fiscal Year 2019-2020
Sponsors
Sen. Cameron Henry [R] | Rep. Taylor Barras [R] | Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Tanner Magee [R] |
Sen. John Alario [R] | Sen. Eric LaFleur [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 148 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1054) (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 ADOPT (#1038) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 148 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#982) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 ADOPT (#1038) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 148 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#982) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 148 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 60. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Alario, and Allain. |
2019-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Henry, Foil, and Dustin Miller. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Notice given. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 7 for 05/30. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 05/09/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (20-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |