LA HB147 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-01 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to charges collected by public license tag agents (EN GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to charges collected by public license tag agents (EN GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 147 FINAL PASSAGE (#62) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-01HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-04HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 69.
2021-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-26HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021.
2021-04-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-03-19HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
2021-03-18HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-03-18HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB147&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204935
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215916
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228932
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231952
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1204937
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212501
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216103
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217039
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229835
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228578

Bill Comments 750

feedback