LA HB146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: May 22, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: May 22, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions of law regarding the methods of wagering at gaming facilities
Title
Amends provisions of law regarding the methods of wagering at gaming facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#1001) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 146, FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Effective date: May 22, 2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 175. | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-14 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended | |
2012-04-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-04 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-04-03 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-02 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-02 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-03-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/2/2012. | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/29/2012. | |
2012-03-22 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-21 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-17 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2012. | |
2012-02-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-17 | Prefiled. |