LA HB1410 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the La. Intrastate Rail Compact in DOTD, relative to powers, duties, responsibilities, and functions of the compact
Title
Creates the La. Intrastate Rail Compact in DOTD, relative to powers, duties, responsibilities, and functions of the compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1410, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1609) (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1410, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1607) (Y: 45 N: 50 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1410, FINAL PASSAGE (#1301) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1410, CO-AUTHORS (#1300) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1410, FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1410, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1607) (Y: 45 N: 50 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1410, FINAL PASSAGE (#1301) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1410, CO-AUTHORS (#1300) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1410, FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: June 30, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 858. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 59, nays 33, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-02 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-19 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-05-18 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-11 | Reported with amendments (14-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |