LA HB1388 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for changes to the La. State Board of Private Security Examiners
Title
Provides for changes to the La. State Board of Private Security Examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1388, INDEFINITELY POSTPONED (#1741) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1388, FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1388, FINAL PASSAGE (#1138) (Y: 71 N: 14 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-06-07 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-06-04 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-20 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |