LA HB1354 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the sale, barter, trade, and possession of nonindigenous and poisonous snakes and constrictors
Title
Provides relative to the sale, barter, trade, and possession of nonindigenous and poisonous snakes and constrictors
Sponsors
Rep. Dorothy Hill [D] | Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1354, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1495) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate HB 3rd & Final Ordered Subj to Call (#1154) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1354, AMENDMENT # 3807 BY SHAW (#1153) (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1354, FINAL PASSAGE (#791) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate HB 3rd & Final Ordered Subj to Call (#1154) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1354, AMENDMENT # 3807 BY SHAW (#1153) (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 1354, FINAL PASSAGE (#791) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 855. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-25 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-06 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-05 | Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular). | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title. |