LA HB1300 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to limits applicable to contributions made by a political committee to a recognized political party or any committee thereof
Title
Provides relative to limits applicable to contributions made by a political committee to a recognized political party or any committee thereof
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1300, FINAL PASSAGE (#1746) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1300, FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1300, FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: June 30, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 848. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title. |