LA HB121 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the composition of schedules for controlled dangerous substances (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Amends the composition of schedules for controlled dangerous substances (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 121, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1585) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 121, FINAL PASSAGE (#1343) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 121, FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 121, FINAL PASSAGE (#1343) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 121, FINAL PASSAGE (#133) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 810. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-14 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-04-13 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-08 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-07 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2010. | |
2010-03-04 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-04 | Prefiled. |