LA HB1204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB682
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the reinstatement of driving privileges associated with a violation of criminal law and extends time in which to request an administrative hearing following a DWI arrest
Title
Provides relative to the reinstatement of driving privileges associated with a violation of criminal law and extends time in which to request an administrative hearing following a DWI arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 1204, FINAL PASSAGE (#888) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-05-16 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2012-05-15 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (11-4). |
Same As/Similar To
HB682 (Replaces) 2012-04-25 - Becomes HB No. 1204.