LA HB1198 | 2012 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB60
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the merger of the La. School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of La. (EG DECREASE FC SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to the merger of the La. School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of La. (EG DECREASE FC SG EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Notice removed. | |
2012-04-25 | Notice given. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2012. | |
2012-04-18 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-17 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 60 reported by the Committee on Retirement (8-4). |
Same As/Similar To
HB60 (Replaces) 2012-04-17 - Becomes HB No. 1198.