LA HB60 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Becomes HB No. 1198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Becomes HB No. 1198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to merger of the La. School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of La. (OR DECREASE FC SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to merger of the La. School Employees' Retirement System into the Teachers' Retirement System of La. (OR DECREASE FC SG EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Becomes HB No. 1198. | |
2012-04-16 | Reported by substitute (8-4) (Regular) | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-27 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB60 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=768134 |