LA HB1158 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to pretrial procedure in civil matters
Title
Provides with respect to pretrial procedure in civil matters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1158, FINAL PASSAGE (#667) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2012. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |
2012-04-04 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title. |