LA HB1146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to intrafamily adoptions
Title
Provides relative to intrafamily adoptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1146, ADOPT (#2026) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1942) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1660) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1146, FINAL PASSAGE (#1498) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, FINAL PASSAGE (#769) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1942) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1660) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1146, FINAL PASSAGE (#1498) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1146, FINAL PASSAGE (#769) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 738. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-20 | Conference committee report received. | |
2010-06-20 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-06-18 | House conferees appointed: Landry, Burns, Tim, and Foil. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-18 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Quinn, Guillory, Elbert, and Hebert. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 12, 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |