LA HB1141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain public school governing authorities with a policy of denying nutrition to students to implement certain procedures (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain public school governing authorities with a policy of denying nutrition to students to implement certain procedures (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 1141, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1863) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1141, FINAL PASSAGE (#1771) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1141, FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1141, FINAL PASSAGE (#1771) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1141, FINAL PASSAGE (#917) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 737. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-18 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-14 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-11 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 19, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |