LA HB112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to criminal convictions which disqualify a person from becoming a foster or adoptive parent or relative guardian of a child

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to criminal convictions which disqualify a person from becoming a foster or adoptive parent or relative guardian of a child

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#435) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-16SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-06HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback