LA HB1078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB1049
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 06/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of Louisiana timber and agriculture transportation group self-insurance funds (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes the creation of Louisiana timber and agriculture transportation group self-insurance funds (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1078 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1612) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1078 FINAL PASSAGE (#1307) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1078 FINAL PASSAGE (#889) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1078 FINAL PASSAGE (#1307) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1078 FINAL PASSAGE (#889) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 06/17/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 586. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1049 reported by the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development (14-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Replaces) 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1078.