LA HB1049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1078.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1078.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of Louisiana timber and agriculture transportation group self-insurance funds
Title
Authorizes the creation of Louisiana timber and agriculture transportation group self-insurance funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Becomes HB 1078. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported by substitute (14-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |