LA HB1040 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to payment processing services
Title
Provides relative to payment processing services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1040 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1572) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1040 FINAL PASSAGE (#1188) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1040 FINAL PASSAGE (#624) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1040 FINAL PASSAGE (#1188) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 1040 FINAL PASSAGE (#624) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 580. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |