LA HB1035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Underground Storage Tank Program
Title
Provides relative to the Underground Storage Tank Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1035 FINAL PASSAGE (#830) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 1035 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 1035 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 277. |
2022-05-26 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |