LA HB10 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in Jackson Parish (Item #54)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in Jackson Parish (Item #54)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-15SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-13SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-10-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
2020-10-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-06HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-09-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-09-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback