KY SR92 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - adopted 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm the appointment of Ken Perry to the Northern Kentucky University Board of Regents for a term expiring June 30, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Ken Perry to the Northern Kentucky University Board of Regents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1852 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30Senateadopted 38-0
2021-03-30Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 30, 2021
2021-03-11Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2021-02-24Senateto Education (S)
2021-02-22Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback