KY SR26 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Kentucky farmers and recognize February 20 to 26, 2022, as Food Check-Out Week.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring Kentucky's farmers for helping provide citizens with the most nutritious and affordable food in the world, and recognizing February 20 to 26, 2022, as Food Check-Out Week in Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2022-02-18 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-01-10 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/sr26.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/sr26/orig_bill.pdf |