KY SR161 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - passed 36-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-09 - passed 36-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the reappointment of Joseph J. Koester to the Board of Directors of Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2021.
Title
Confirm the reappointment of Joseph J. Koester to the Board of Directors of Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 427 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 9, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR161.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR161/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR161/vote_history.pdf |