KY SR138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - 3rd reading, passed 37-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - 3rd reading, passed 37-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designate the first week of December 2018 as Cancer Screen Week.
Title
Designate the first week of December 2018 as Cancer Screen Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 654 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR138.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR138/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR138/vote_history.pdf |