KY SR111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - adopted 31-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - adopted 31-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the reappointment of R. Roland Case as administrative law judge for the Department of Workers' Claims for a term expiring on December 31, 2025.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the reappointment of R. Roland Case as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2093 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2092 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2092 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | adopted 31-0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-02-14 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |