KY SJR59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 193)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 193)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish a work group to create written recommendations for distribution throughout Kentucky for individuals who suffer from substance use disorder in order to reduce the barriers the individuals experience when attempting to access opioid disorder treatment programs.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to create an advisory committee to investigate funding mechanisms and feasibility studies around recovery housing including a full continuum of care for the treatment of individuals with substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1856 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 442 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1597 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 442 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1597 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 193) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-11 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | received in House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 36-0 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |