KY SJR27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Department of Education to make Veterans Day a holiday and to close schools on that day.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Kentucky Department of Education to annually remind superintendents to provide a mandatory Veterans Day program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1692 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |